PA HB1945 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 37-0)
Status: Engrossed on December 12 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-12-20 - Referred to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending the act of April 9, 1929 (P.L.177, No.175), known as The Administrative Code of 1929, in Commonwealth budget procedures, further providing for submission of budget to General Assembly.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In Commonwealth budget procedures, further providing for submission of budget to General Assembly.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-12-12 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-12 - House - House Floor: HB 1945 PN 2783, FP (Y: 116 N: 76 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2017-12-11 - House - House Floor: HB 1945 PN 2783, 2017 A5076, CARROLL (Y: 71 N: 117 NV: 1 Abs: 12) [FAIL]
2017-12-05 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt Amendment A04990 (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-05 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Amended (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-12-20SenateReferred to APPROPRIATIONS
2017-12-12SenateIn the Senate
2017-12-12HouseThird consideration and final passage (116-76)
2017-12-12HouseRe-reported as committed
2017-12-11HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2017-12-11HouseSecond consideration
2017-12-06HouseRemoved from table
2017-12-05HouseLaid on the table
2017-12-05HouseFirst consideration
2017-12-05HouseReported as amended
2017-12-01HouseReferred to APPROPRIATIONS

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2017&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=1945
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=1945&pn=2768
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=1945&pn=2783
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=12/05/2017&RollCallId=1123
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=12/05/2017&RollCallId=1122
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=919
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=927
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=12/12/2017&RollCallId=1178

Bill Comments

feedback