PA HB1916 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 20-7)
Status: Engrossed on April 4 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-10-15 - Laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 4 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-10-15 - Laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An Act itemizing public improvement projects for flood protection and flood damage repair to be constructed by the Department of General Services, together with their estimated financial costs; providing for the adoption of specific disaster mitigation or assistance projects or flood assistance projects, together with their estimated financial costs; authorizing the use of interest earnings held by the Commonwealth Financing Authority for funding the projects; and making appropriations.
Title
Itemizing public improvement projects for flood protection and flood damage repair to be constructed by the Department of General Services, together with their estimated financial costs; providing for the adoption of specific disaster mitigation or assistance projects or flood assistance projects, together with their estimated financial costs; authorizing the use of interest earnings held by the Commonwealth Financing Authority for funding the projects; and making appropriations.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-06-13 - Senate - HB 1916 PN 3730, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-04 - Senate - Reported as Amended (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-04 - House - HB 1916 PN 3298, FP (Y: 193 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-03-28 - House - HB 1916 PN 3265, 2011 A9570, PEIFER (Y: 192 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-06-04 - Senate - Reported as Amended (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-04 - House - HB 1916 PN 3298, FP (Y: 193 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-03-28 - House - HB 1916 PN 3265, 2011 A9570, PEIFER (Y: 192 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-10-15 | House | Laid on the table |
2012-10-03 | House | Re-reported on concurrence, as amended with Prior Printer's No. 3298 |
2012-06-13 | House | Referred to RULES |
2012-06-13 | House | In the House |
2012-06-13 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (47-0) |
2012-06-12 | Senate | Amended on third consideration |
2012-06-05 | Senate | Second consideration |
2012-06-04 | Senate | First consideration |
2012-06-04 | Senate | Reported as amended |
2012-04-20 | Senate | Referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2012-04-04 | Senate | In the Senate |
2012-04-04 | House | Third consideration and final passage (193-2) |
2012-04-02 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2012-03-28 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2012-03-28 | House | Second consideration, with amendments |
2012-03-27 | House | Removed from table |
2012-03-26 | House | Laid on the table |
2012-03-26 | House | First consideration |
2012-03-26 | House | Reported as amended |
2011-11-09 | House | Referred to APPROPRIATIONS |