PA HB190 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 16-6)
Status: Engrossed on November 24 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-12-04 - Referred to AGING AND YOUTH
Pending: Senate Aging & Youth Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on November 24 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-12-04 - Referred to AGING AND YOUTH
Pending: Senate Aging & Youth Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of August 26, 1971 (P.L.351, No.91), known as the State Lottery Law, in pharmaceutical assistance for the elderly, further providing for the definition of "income."
Title
In pharmaceutical assistance for the elderly, further providing for the definition of "income."
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-11-24 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-11-24 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-11-24 - House - House Floor: HB 190 PN 182, FP (Y: 197 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2015-11-18 - House - House Aging And Older Adult Services: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-11-18 - House - House Aging And Older Adult Services: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-11-24 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-11-24 - House - House Floor: HB 190 PN 182, FP (Y: 197 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2015-11-18 - House - House Aging And Older Adult Services: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-11-18 - House - House Aging And Older Adult Services: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-12-04 | Senate | Referred to AGING AND YOUTH |
2015-11-24 | Senate | In the Senate |
2015-11-24 | House | Third consideration and final passage (197-0) |
2015-11-24 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2015-11-23 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2015-11-23 | House | Second consideration |
2015-11-19 | House | Removed from table |
2015-11-18 | House | Laid on the table |
2015-11-18 | House | First consideration |
2015-11-18 | House | Reported as committed |
2015-01-23 | House | Referred to AGING AND OLDER ADULT SERVICES |