PA HB1881 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 19-10)
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-03-16 - Referred to TRANSPORTATION
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act designating a bridge on that portion of State Route 1041 over the Mahoning Creek in Grant Township and Canoe Township, Indiana County, as the Army SPC Christine L. Mayes Memorial Bridge.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Designating a bridge on that portion of State Route 1041 over the Mahoning Creek in Grant Township and Canoe Township, Indiana County, as the Army SPC Christine L. Mayes Memorial Bridge.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-13 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-13 - House - House Floor: HB 1881 PN 2622, FP (Y: 191 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2018-01-23 - House - House Transportation: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-16SenateReferred to TRANSPORTATION
2018-03-13SenateIn the Senate
2018-03-13HouseThird consideration and final passage (191-0)
2018-03-13HouseRe-reported as committed
2018-03-12HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2018-03-12HouseSecond consideration
2018-02-06HouseRemoved from table
2018-01-23HouseLaid on the table
2018-01-23HouseFirst consideration
2018-01-23HouseReported as committed
2017-10-23HouseReferred to TRANSPORTATION

Pennsylvania State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback