PA HB1843 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-2)
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-04 - Referred to JUDICIARY
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-04 - Referred to JUDICIARY
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Title 42 (Judiciary and Judicial Procedure) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in depositions and witnesses, providing for sentencing considerations for child victim offenders.
Title
In depositions and witnesses, providing for sentencing considerations for child victim offenders.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-18 - House - House Floor: HB 1843 PN 2447, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 125 N: 76 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-18 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-12-13 - House - House Floor: HB 1843 PN 2294, 2023 A3295 (Y: 101 N: 102 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2023-12-13 - House - House Floor: HB 1843 PN 2294, 2023 A3294 (Y: 203 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-12-08 - House - House Judiciary: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 24 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-18 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-12-13 - House - House Floor: HB 1843 PN 2294, 2023 A3295 (Y: 101 N: 102 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2023-12-13 - House - House Floor: HB 1843 PN 2294, 2023 A3294 (Y: 203 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-12-08 - House - House Judiciary: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 24 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-04 | Senate | Referred to JUDICIARY |
2024-03-18 | Senate | In the Senate |
2024-03-18 | House | Third consideration and final passage (125-76) |
2024-03-18 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2023-12-13 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2023-12-13 | House | Second consideration, with amendments |
2023-12-12 | House | Removed from table |
2023-12-10 | House | Laid on the table |
2023-12-10 | House | First consideration |
2023-12-10 | House | Reported as committed |
2023-11-13 | House | Referred to JUDICIARY |