PA HB1841 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 36-6)
Status: Passed on July 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-14 - Act No. 57
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 36-6)
Status: Passed on July 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-14 - Act No. 57
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Title 44 (Law and Justice) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, providing for law enforcement background investigations, for duties of the Municipal Police Officers' Education and Training Commission, law enforcement agencies and employers and for immunity from liability and violations.
Title
Providing for law enforcement background investigations, for duties of the Municipal Police Officers' Education and Training Commission, law enforcement agencies and employers and for immunity from liability and violations.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-30 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 1841 PN 4011, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-30 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-24 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-24 - Senate - Senate Law And Justice: Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-24 - House - House Floor: HB 1841 PN 4011, FP (Y: 201 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-06-23 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-23 - House - House Floor: HB 1841 PN 3931, 2019 A6249, BRIGGS (Y: 201 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-06-15 - House - House Judiciary: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-15 - House - House Judiciary: Adopt Amendment A06225 (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-30 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-24 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-24 - Senate - Senate Law And Justice: Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-24 - House - House Floor: HB 1841 PN 4011, FP (Y: 201 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-06-23 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-23 - House - House Floor: HB 1841 PN 3931, 2019 A6249, BRIGGS (Y: 201 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-06-15 - House - House Judiciary: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-15 - House - House Judiciary: Adopt Amendment A06225 (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-14 | Senate | Act No. 57 |
2020-07-14 | Senate | Approved by the Governor |
2020-07-07 | Senate | Presented to the Governor |
2020-07-07 | Senate | Signed in House |
2020-06-30 | Senate | Signed in Senate |
2020-06-30 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (50-0) |
2020-06-30 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2020-06-29 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2020-06-29 | Senate | Second consideration |
2020-06-24 | Senate | First consideration |
2020-06-24 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2020-06-24 | Senate | Referred to LAW AND JUSTICE |
2020-06-24 | Senate | In the Senate |
2020-06-24 | House | Third consideration and final passage (201-0) |
2020-06-24 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2020-06-23 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2020-06-23 | House | Second consideration, with amendments |
2020-06-23 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2020-06-15 | House | Re-committed to RULES |
2020-06-15 | House | First consideration |
2020-06-15 | House | Reported as amended |
2019-09-19 | House | Referred to JUDICIARY |