PA HB1840 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 30-0)
Status: Passed on October 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-10-24 - Act No. 111
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending the act of June 2, 1915 (P.L.736, No.338), known as the Workers' Compensation Act, in liability and compensation, further providing for schedule of compensation, for computation of benefits and for physical examination or expert interview.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In liability and compensation, further providing for schedule of compensation, for computation of benefits and for physical examination or expert interview.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-10-17 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 1840 PN 3802, FINAL PASSAGE-RECONSIDERED (Y: 34 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-17 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 1840 PN 3802, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 33 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-15 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 17 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-02 - Senate - Senate Labor And Industry: Reported as Amended (Y: 8 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-22 - House - House Floor: HB 1840 PN 3802, FP (Y: 115 N: 80 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-06-22 - House - House Floor: HB 1840 PN 3802, MOT PROCEED WITH BILL, REED (Y: 179 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-06-22 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 21 N: 14 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-21 - House - House Floor: HB 1840 PN 3595, 2017 A7879, KAUFFMAN (Y: 116 N: 79 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-06-04 - House - House Labor And Industry: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 16 N: 9 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-04 - House - House Labor And Industry: Adopt Amendment A07131 (Y: 16 N: 9 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-10-24SenateAct No. 111
2018-10-24SenateApproved by the Governor
2018-10-18SenatePresented to the Governor
2018-10-17SenateSigned in Senate
2018-10-17SenateSigned in House
2018-10-17SenateFinal passage (34-15)
2018-10-17SenateVote on final passage reconsidered
2018-10-17SenateThird consideration and final passage (33-16)
2018-10-16SenateMotion to revert to Prior Printer's No. 3802
2018-10-15SenateRe-reported as committed
2018-10-03SenateRe-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
2018-10-03SenateSecond consideration
2018-10-02SenateFirst consideration
2018-10-02SenateReported as amended
2018-10-01SenateAmended in Senate Committee on LABOR AND INDUSTRY
2018-06-22SenateReferred to LABOR AND INDUSTRY
2018-06-22SenateIn the Senate
2018-06-22HouseThird consideration and final passage (115-80)
2018-06-22HouseRe-reported as committed
2018-06-21HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2018-06-21HouseSecond consideration, with amendments
2018-06-11HouseRemoved from table
2018-06-04HouseLaid on the table
2018-06-04HouseFirst consideration
2018-06-04HouseReported as amended
2017-10-02HouseReferred to LABOR AND INDUSTRY

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2017&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=1840
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=1840&pn=2513
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=1840&pn=3595
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=1840&pn=3802
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=1840&pn=4147
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=26&theDate=06/04/2018&RollCallId=1574
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=26&theDate=06/04/2018&RollCallId=1575
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=1373
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=06/22/2018&RollCallId=1834
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=1429
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=1430
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=13&theDate=10/02/2018&RollCallId=1172
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=3&theDate=10/15/2018&RollCallId=1205
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=S&rc_nbr=736
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=S&rc_nbr=747

Bill Comments

feedback