PA HB1823 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 11 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-28 - Referred to LOCAL GOVERNMENT
Pending: Senate Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 11 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-28 - Referred to LOCAL GOVERNMENT
Pending: Senate Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of May 1, 1933 (P.L.103, No.69), known as The Second Class Township Code, further providing for ordinances.
Title
Further providing for ordinances.
Sponsors
Rep. Kate Harper [R] | Rep. Chris Ross [R] | Rep. Mauree Gingrich [R] | Rep. Robert Freeman [D] |
Rep. Mary Jo Daley [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-04-11 - House - House Floor: HB 1823 PN 3020, FP (Y: 111 N: 84 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2016-04-06 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-05 - House - House Floor: HB 1823 PN 3020, 2015 A6402, JAMES (Y: 90 N: 102 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [FAIL]
2016-04-05 - House - House Floor: HB 1823 PN 3020, 2015 A6401, MALONEY (Y: 72 N: 119 NV: 1 Abs: 11) [FAIL]
2016-03-23 - House - House Local Government: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 10 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-23 - House - House Local Government: Adopt Amendment A06261 (Y: 15 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-06 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-05 - House - House Floor: HB 1823 PN 3020, 2015 A6402, JAMES (Y: 90 N: 102 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [FAIL]
2016-04-05 - House - House Floor: HB 1823 PN 3020, 2015 A6401, MALONEY (Y: 72 N: 119 NV: 1 Abs: 11) [FAIL]
2016-03-23 - House - House Local Government: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 10 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-23 - House - House Local Government: Adopt Amendment A06261 (Y: 15 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-28 | Senate | Referred to LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2016-04-11 | Senate | In the Senate |
2016-04-11 | House | Third consideration and final passage (111-84) |
2016-04-06 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2016-04-05 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2016-04-05 | House | Second consideration |
2016-04-04 | House | Removed from table |
2016-03-23 | House | Laid on the table |
2016-03-23 | House | First consideration |
2016-03-23 | House | Reported as amended |
2016-01-28 | House | Referred to LOCAL GOVERNMENT |