PA HB1742 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on October 1 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-10-17 - First consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending the act of June 13, 1967 (P.L.31, No.21), known as the Human Services Code, in departmental powers and duties as to supervision, providing for Keystone STARS Program participants; and, in departmental powers and duties as to licensing, further providing for fees, providing for Keystone STARS Program participants and further providing for definitions.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In departmental powers and duties as to supervision, providing for Keystone STARS Program participants; and, in departmental powers and duties as to licensing, further providing for fees, providing for Keystone STARS Program participants and further providing for definitions.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-10-17 - Senate - Senate Health And Human Services: Reported as Committed (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-01 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-01 - House - House Floor: HB 1742 PN 4080, FP (Y: 182 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2018-09-25 - House - House Floor: HB 1742 PN 3567, 2017 A9318, NESBIT (Y: 195 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-05-23 - House - House Children And Youth: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-23 - House - House Children And Youth: Adopt Amendment A07158 (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-10-17SenateFirst consideration
2018-10-17SenateReported as committed
2018-10-10SenateReferred to HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
2018-10-01SenateIn the Senate
2018-10-01HouseThird consideration and final passage (182-0)
2018-10-01HouseRe-reported as committed
2018-09-25HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2018-09-25HouseSecond consideration, with amendments
2018-06-19HouseRemoved from table
2018-05-23HouseLaid on the table
2018-05-23HouseFirst consideration
2018-05-23HouseReported as amended
2017-08-24HouseReferred to CHILDREN AND YOUTH

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2017&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=1742
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=1742&pn=2339
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=1742&pn=3567
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=1742&pn=4080
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=48&theDate=05/23/2018&RollCallId=1548
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=48&theDate=05/23/2018&RollCallId=1549
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=1470
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=1486
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=10/01/2018&RollCallId=1980
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=33&theDate=10/17/2018&RollCallId=1228

Bill Comments

feedback