PA HB1738 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 12-6-1)
Status: Engrossed on December 6 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-12-08 - Referred to JUDICIARY
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending Title 42 (Judiciary and Judicial Procedure) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in commencement of proceedings, further providing for definitions and providing for nonmunicipal police extraterritorial jurisdiction for purposes of municipal police jurisdiction.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In commencement of proceedings, further providing for definitions and providing for nonmunicipal police extraterritorial jurisdiction for purposes of municipal police jurisdiction.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-12-06 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-06 - House - House Floor: HB 1738 PN 2335, FP (Y: 187 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2017-11-21 - House - House Judiciary: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-12-08SenateReferred to JUDICIARY
2017-12-06SenateIn the Senate
2017-12-06HouseThird consideration and final passage (187-0)
2017-12-06HouseRe-reported as committed
2017-12-05HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2017-12-05HouseSecond consideration
2017-12-04HouseRemoved from table
2017-11-21HouseLaid on the table
2017-11-21HouseFirst consideration
2017-11-21HouseReported as committed
2017-08-24HouseReferred to JUDICIARY

Pennsylvania State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback