PA HB1705 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 19-11)
Status: Engrossed on October 22 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-10-31 - Referred to VETERANS AFFAIRS AND EMERGENCY PREPAREDNESS
Pending: Senate Veterans Affairs & Emergency Preparedness Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending Title 35 (Health and Safety) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in incentives for municipal volunteers of fire companies and nonprofit emergency medical services agencies, further providing for definitions, for real property tax credit and for rejection and appeal.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In incentives for municipal volunteers of fire companies and nonprofit emergency medical services agencies, further providing for definitions, for real property tax credit and for rejection and appeal.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-10-22 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-10-22 - House - House Floor: HB 1705 PN 2297, FP (Y: 200 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-09-18 - House - House Veterans Affairs And Emergency Preparedness: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-10-31SenateReferred to VETERANS AFFAIRS AND EMERGENCY PREPAREDNESS
2019-10-22SenateIn the Senate
2019-10-22HouseThird consideration and final passage (200-0)
2019-10-22HouseRe-reported as committed
2019-10-21HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2019-10-21HouseSecond consideration
2019-09-25HouseRemoved from table
2019-09-18HouseLaid on the table
2019-09-18HouseFirst consideration
2019-09-18HouseReported as committed
2019-07-08HouseReferred to VETERANS AFFAIRS AND EMERGENCY PREPAREDNESS

Pennsylvania State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback