PA HB1703 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on November 3 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-03 - Act No. 136
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on November 3 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-03 - Act No. 136
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Title 75 (Vehicles) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in snowmobiles and all-terrain vehicles, further providing for operation by persons under age sixteen and for mufflers and noise control.
Title
In snowmobiles and all-terrain vehicles, further providing for operation by persons under age sixteen and for mufflers and noise control.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-10-26 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 1703 PN 2849, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-28 - Senate - Senate Transportation: Reported as Committed (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-21 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-21 - House - House Floor: HB 1703 PN 2849, FP (Y: 183 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2016-02-10 - House - House Tourism And Recreational Development: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-10 - House - House Tourism And Recreational Development: Adopt Amendment A04503 (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-10 - House - House Tourism And Recreational Development: Adopt Amendment A04502 (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-10 - House - House Tourism And Recreational Development: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-10 - House - House Tourism And Recreational Development: Adopt Amendment A04503 (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-10 - House - House Tourism And Recreational Development: Adopt Amendment A04502 (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-28 - Senate - Senate Transportation: Reported as Committed (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-21 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-21 - House - House Floor: HB 1703 PN 2849, FP (Y: 183 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2016-02-10 - House - House Tourism And Recreational Development: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-10 - House - House Tourism And Recreational Development: Adopt Amendment A04503 (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-10 - House - House Tourism And Recreational Development: Adopt Amendment A04502 (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-10 - House - House Tourism And Recreational Development: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-10 - House - House Tourism And Recreational Development: Adopt Amendment A04503 (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-10 - House - House Tourism And Recreational Development: Adopt Amendment A04502 (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-11-03 | Senate | Act No. 136 |
2016-11-03 | Senate | Approved by the Governor |
2016-10-27 | Senate | Presented to the Governor |
2016-10-26 | Senate | Signed in Senate |
2016-10-26 | Senate | Signed in House |
2016-10-26 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (48-0) |
2016-10-19 | Senate | Second consideration |
2016-10-18 | Senate | Removed from table |
2016-07-13 | Senate | Laid on the table |
2016-06-28 | Senate | First consideration |
2016-06-28 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2016-04-01 | Senate | Referred to TRANSPORTATION |
2016-03-21 | Senate | In the Senate |
2016-03-21 | House | Third consideration and final passage (183-8) |
2016-03-21 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2016-03-16 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2016-03-16 | House | Second consideration |
2016-03-15 | House | Removed from table |
2016-02-10 | House | Laid on the table |
2016-02-10 | House | First consideration |
2016-02-10 | House | Reported as amended |
2015-11-16 | House | Referred to TOURISM AND RECREATIONAL DEVELOPMENT |