PA HB169 | 2007-2008 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 28-4)
Status: Engrossed on June 30 2007 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2007-10-22 - Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
Status: Engrossed on June 30 2007 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2007-10-22 - Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
Summary
An Act amending the act of December 19, 1988 (P.L.1262, No.156), known as the Local Option Small Games of Chance Act, further providing for definitions, for permitted games of chance, for prize limits, for insured games, for limited sales, for recordkeeping, for eligible organizations' use of locations for conducting small games of chance, for separate individual prize limitations and for advertising.
Title
An Act amending the act of December 19, 1988 (P.L.1262, No.156), known as the Local Option Small Games of Chance Act, further providing for definitions, for permitted games of chance, for prize limits, for insured games, for limited sales, for recordkeeping, for eligible organizations' use of locations for conducting small games of chance, for separate individual prize limitations and for advertising.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2007-10-22 | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS | |
2007-10-15 | First consideration | |
2007-10-15 | Reported as amended | |
2007-06-30 | Referred to FINANCE | |
2007-06-30 | Third consideration and final passage | |
2007-06-30 | Re-reported as committed | |
2007-06-29 | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS | |
2007-06-29 | Second consideration, with amendments | |
2007-06-25 | Re-reported as committed | |
2007-06-14 | Re-committed to RULES | |
2007-06-14 | First consideration | |
2007-06-14 | Reported as amended | |
2007-02-01 | Referred to GAMING OVERSIGHT |
Pennsylvania State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2007&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=169 |