PA HB1659 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 31-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 1 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-10-15 - Re-reported as committed
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending the act of June 13, 1967 (P.L.31, No.21), known as the Human Services Code, in general powers and duties, providing for work requirements for the Supplemental Nutrition Assistance Program.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In general powers and duties, providing for work requirements for the Supplemental Nutrition Assistance Program.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-10-15 - Senate - Senate Rules And Executive Nominations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-13 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 17 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-12 - Senate - Senate Health And Human Services: Reported as Committed (Y: 8 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-01 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 21 N: 14 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-01 - House - House Floor: HB 1659 PN 3461, FP (Y: 108 N: 79 NV: 1 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2018-04-30 - House - House Floor: HB 1659 PN 3351, 2017 A6870, MULLERY (Y: 191 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2018-04-16 - House - House Health: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 16 N: 8 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-16 - House - House Health: Adopt Amendment A06478 (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-10-15SenateRe-reported as committed
2018-06-21SenateRe-referred to RULES AND EXECUTIVE NOMINATIONS
2018-06-13SenateRe-reported as committed
2018-06-13SenateRe-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
2018-06-13SenateSecond consideration
2018-06-12SenateFirst consideration
2018-06-12SenateReported as committed
2018-05-18SenateReferred to HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
2018-05-01SenateIn the Senate
2018-05-01HouseThird consideration and final passage (108-79)
2018-05-01HouseRe-reported as committed
2018-04-30HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2018-04-30HouseSecond consideration, with amendments
2018-04-18HouseRemoved from table
2018-04-16HouseLaid on the table
2018-04-16HouseFirst consideration
2018-04-16HouseReported as amended
2017-07-11HouseReferred to HEALTH

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2017&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=1659
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=1659&pn=2227
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=1659&pn=3351
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=1659&pn=3461
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=55&theDate=04/16/2018&RollCallId=1428
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=55&theDate=04/16/2018&RollCallId=1429
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=1155
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=1222
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=05/01/2018&RollCallId=1492
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=33&theDate=06/12/2018&RollCallId=927
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=3&theDate=06/13/2018&RollCallId=963
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=17&theDate=10/15/2018&RollCallId=1189

Bill Comments

feedback