PA HB16 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 15-6)
Status: Passed on March 3 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-03 - Act No. 3
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act designating a bridge, identified as Bridge Key 40269, on that portion of US 219 Southbound over State Route 2047, Summit Township, Somerset County, as the SP4 Michael William Twigg Memorial Bridge.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Designating a bridge, identified as Bridge Key 40269, on that portion of US 219 Southbound over State Route 2047, Summit Township, Somerset County, as the SP4 Michael William Twigg Memorial Bridge.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-24 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 16 PN 10, Final Passage (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - Senate - Senate Transportation: Reported as Committed (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - House - House Floor: HB 16 PN 10, FP (Y: 202 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-13 - House - House Transportation: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-03SenateAct No. 3
2021-03-03SenateApproved by the Governor
2021-02-26SenatePresented to the Governor
2021-02-26SenateSigned in House
2021-02-24SenateSigned in Senate
2021-02-24SenateThird consideration and final passage (46-0)
2021-02-23SenateSecond consideration
2021-02-22SenateFirst consideration
2021-02-22SenateReported as committed
2021-02-04SenateReferred to TRANSPORTATION
2021-02-03SenateIn the Senate
2021-02-03HouseThird consideration and final passage (202-0)
2021-02-03HouseRe-reported as committed
2021-01-27HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2021-01-27HouseSecond consideration
2021-01-26HouseRemoved from table
2021-01-25HouseLaid on the table
2021-01-25HouseFirst consideration
2021-01-25HouseReported as committed
2021-01-11HouseReferred to TRANSPORTATION

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2021&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=16
Texthttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2021&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0016&pn=0010
Supplementhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/WU01/LI/BI/FN/2021/0/HB0016P0010.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2021&sInd=0&cteeCde=38&theDate=01/13/2021&RollCallId=5
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2021&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=23
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2021&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=02/03/2021&RollCallId=96
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2021&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=19&theDate=02/22/2021&RollCallId=30
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2021&sess_ind=0&rc_body=S&rc_nbr=43

Bill Comments

feedback