PA HB1588 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 20-2)
Status: Engrossed on November 21 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-12-01 - Referred to AGING AND YOUTH
Pending: Senate Aging & Youth Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending the act of August 26, 1971 (P.L.351, No.91), known as the State Lottery Law, in pharmaceutical assistance for the elderly, further providing for income verification.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In pharmaceutical assistance for the elderly, further providing for income verification.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-11-21 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-11-21 - House - House Floor: HB 1588 PN 2188, FP (Y: 191 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2017-10-18 - House - House Aging And Older Adult Services: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-12-01SenateReferred to AGING AND YOUTH
2017-11-21SenateIn the Senate
2017-11-21HouseThird consideration and final passage (191-0)
2017-11-21HouseRe-reported as committed
2017-11-20HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2017-11-20HouseSecond consideration
2017-10-25HouseRemoved from table
2017-10-18HouseLaid on the table
2017-10-18HouseFirst consideration
2017-10-18HouseReported as committed
2017-06-29HouseCorrective Reprint, Printer's No. 2188
2017-06-20HouseReferred to AGING AND OLDER ADULT SERVICES

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2017&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=1588
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=1588&pn=2080
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=1588&pn=2188
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=32&theDate=10/18/2017&RollCallId=1030
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=844
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=11/21/2017&RollCallId=1081

Bill Comments

feedback