PA HB1577 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 15-3)
Status: Introduced on June 8 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-11-18 - Removed from table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 8 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-11-18 - Removed from table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of October 31, 2006 (P.L.1210, No.133), known as the Price Gouging Act, further providing for definitions, for price gouging prohibited and for investigation.
Title
Further providing for definitions, for price gouging prohibited and for investigation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-14 - House - House Veterans Affairs And Emergency Preparedness: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-11-18 | House | Removed from table |
2022-11-18 | House | Laid on the table |
2022-07-06 | House | Removed from table |
2022-07-06 | House | Laid on the table |
2022-05-24 | House | Removed from table |
2022-05-24 | House | Laid on the table |
2022-01-25 | House | Removed from table |
2021-11-10 | House | Laid on the table |
2021-11-10 | House | Removed from table |
2021-09-15 | House | Laid on the table |
2021-09-15 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2021-06-14 | House | Re-committed to RULES |
2021-06-14 | House | First consideration |
2021-06-14 | House | Reported as committed |
2021-06-08 | House | Referred to VETERANS AFFAIRS AND EMERGENCY PREPAREDNESS |