PA HB1539 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 25-10)
Status: Passed on October 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-10-23 - Act No. 88
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending Title 23 (Domestic Relations) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in standby guardianship, further providing for definitions and for scope and providing for temporary guardianship; in child protective services, further providing for release of information in confidential reports; and making editorial changes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In standby guardianship, further providing for definitions and for scope and providing for temporary guardianship; in child protective services, further providing for release of information in confidential reports; and making editorial changes.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-10-16 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 1539 PN 3353, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-12 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Reported as Committed (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-17 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-17 - House - House Floor: HB 1539 PN 3353, FP (Y: 192 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-04-16 - House - House Floor: HB 1539 PN 3311, 2017 A6458, TOOHIL (Y: 195 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-04-10 - House - House Children And Youth: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 24 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-10 - House - House Children And Youth: Adopt Amendment A06186 (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-10-23SenateAct No. 88
2018-10-23SenateApproved by the Governor
2018-10-17SenatePresented to the Governor
2018-10-17SenateSigned in Senate
2018-10-17SenateSigned in House
2018-10-16SenateThird consideration and final passage (49-0)
2018-10-01SenateRemoved from table
2018-10-01SenateLaid on the table
2018-06-13SenateSecond consideration
2018-06-12SenateFirst consideration
2018-06-12SenateReported as committed
2018-04-30SenateReferred to JUDICIARY
2018-04-17SenateIn the Senate
2018-04-17HouseThird consideration and final passage (192-0)
2018-04-17HouseRe-reported as committed
2018-04-16HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2018-04-16HouseSecond consideration, with amendments
2018-04-11HouseRemoved from table
2018-04-10HouseLaid on the table
2018-04-10HouseFirst consideration
2018-04-10HouseReported as amended
2017-06-13HouseReferred to CHILDREN AND YOUTH

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2017&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=1539
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=1539&pn=1996
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=1539&pn=3311
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=1539&pn=3353
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=48&theDate=04/10/2018&RollCallId=1398
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=48&theDate=04/10/2018&RollCallId=1399
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=1117
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=1131
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=04/17/2018&RollCallId=1454
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=39&theDate=06/12/2018&RollCallId=933
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=S&rc_nbr=700

Bill Comments

feedback