PA HB1533 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 39-21)
Status: Passed on March 16 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-16 - Act No. 9
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 39-21)
Status: Passed on March 16 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-16 - Act No. 9
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An Act amending Title 51 (Military Affairs) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, further providing for military family relief assistance.
Title
Further providing for military family relief assistance.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-03-08 - Senate - HB 1533 PN 1900, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-06-09 - House - HB 1533 PN 1900, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 194 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-06-09 - House - HB 1533 PN 1900, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 194 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-16 | Act No. 9 | |
2010-03-16 | Approved by the Governor | |
2010-03-10 | Presented to the Governor | |
2010-03-10 | Signed in Senate | |
2010-03-09 | Signed in House | |
2010-03-08 | Third consideration and final passage | |
2010-02-09 | Second consideration | |
2010-01-26 | Re-reported as committed | |
2009-07-09 | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS | |
2009-06-23 | First consideration | |
2009-06-23 | Reported as committed | |
2009-06-11 | Referred to VETERANS AFFAIRS AND EMERGENCY PREPAREDNESS | |
2009-06-09 | In the Senate | |
2009-06-09 | Third consideration and final passage | |
2009-06-09 | Re-reported as committed | |
2009-06-08 | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS | |
2009-06-08 | Second consideration | |
2009-06-08 | Re-reported as committed | |
2009-06-03 | Re-committed to RULES | |
2009-06-03 | First consideration | |
2009-06-03 | Reported as committed | |
2009-05-26 | Referred to VETERANS AFFAIRS AND EMERGENCY PREPAREDNESS |