PA HB1529 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 9-3)
Status: Engrossed on June 21 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-23 - Referred to JUDICIARY
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 21 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-23 - Referred to JUDICIARY
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Title 23 (Domestic Relations) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in adoption, further providing for home study and preplacement report and for report of intention to adopt, repealing provisions relating to report of intermediary and exhibits, further providing for investigation, for contents of petition for adoption and for exhibits, providing for permissible reimbursement of expenses and further providing for time of entry of decree of adoption.
Title
In adoption, further providing for home study and preplacement report and for report of intention to adopt, repealing provisions relating to report of intermediary and exhibits, further providing for investigation, for contents of petition for adoption and for exhibits, providing for permissible reimbursement of expenses and further providing for time of entry of decree of adoption.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-06-21 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-21 - House - House Floor: HB 1529 PN 3513, FP (Y: 198 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-06-20 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-14 - House - House Children And Youth: Adopt Amendment A08217 (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-14 - House - House Children And Youth: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-21 - House - House Floor: HB 1529 PN 3513, FP (Y: 198 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-06-20 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-14 - House - House Children And Youth: Adopt Amendment A08217 (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-14 - House - House Children And Youth: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-23 | Senate | Referred to JUDICIARY |
2016-06-21 | Senate | In the Senate |
2016-06-21 | House | Third consideration and final passage (198-0) |
2016-06-21 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2016-06-20 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2016-06-20 | House | Second consideration |
2016-06-20 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2016-06-14 | House | Re-committed to RULES |
2016-06-14 | House | First consideration |
2016-06-14 | House | Reported as amended |
2015-10-05 | House | Referred to CHILDREN AND YOUTH |