PA HB1444 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 12-2)
Status: Engrossed on June 26 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-29 - Corrective Reprint, Printer's No. 4051
Pending: Senate Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 26 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-29 - Corrective Reprint, Printer's No. 4051
Pending: Senate Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
A Joint Resolution proposing an amendment to the Constitution of the Commonwealth of Pennsylvania, in local government, providing for removal of municipal officers.
Title
A Joint Resolution proposing an amendment to the Constitution of the Commonwealth of Pennsylvania, in local government, providing for removal of municipal officers.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-26 - House - House Floor: HB 1444 PN 2259, FP (Y: 195 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-06-26 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-25 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-25 - House - House Floor: HB 1444 PN 2127, 2019 A1979, B. MILLER (Y: 191 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-06-12 - House - House Local Government: Adopt Amendment A01866 (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-12 - House - House Local Government: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-26 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-25 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-25 - House - House Floor: HB 1444 PN 2127, 2019 A1979, B. MILLER (Y: 191 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-06-12 - House - House Local Government: Adopt Amendment A01866 (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-12 - House - House Local Government: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-29 | Senate | Corrective Reprint, Printer's No. 4051 |
2019-07-08 | Senate | Referred to LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2019-06-26 | Senate | In the Senate |
2019-06-26 | House | Third consideration and final passage (195-6) |
2019-06-26 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2019-06-25 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2019-06-25 | House | Second consideration, with amendments |
2019-06-25 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2019-06-12 | House | Re-committed to RULES |
2019-06-12 | House | First consideration |
2019-06-12 | House | Reported as amended |
2019-05-13 | House | Referred to LOCAL GOVERNMENT |