PA HB1440 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 11-5)
Status: Engrossed on February 9 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-14 - Referred to CONSUMER PROTECTION AND PROFESSIONAL LICENSURE
Pending: Senate Consumer Protection & Professional Licensure Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 9 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-14 - Referred to CONSUMER PROTECTION AND PROFESSIONAL LICENSURE
Pending: Senate Consumer Protection & Professional Licensure Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of December 20, 1985 (P.L.457, No.112), known as the Medical Practice Act of 1985, further providing for definitions, for respiratory therapists, for perfusionist, for genetic counselor and for prosthetists, ortotists, pedorthists and orthotic fitters; providing for medical imaging professionals, radiation therapists and radiologist assistants; further providing for licenses and certificates and general qualification; repealing provisions relating to radiologic procedures and education and training required; and making related and inconsistent repeals.
Title
Further providing for definitions, for respiratory therapists, for perfusionist, for genetic counselor and for prosthetists, ortotists, pedorthists and orthotic fitters; providing for medical imaging professionals, radiation therapists and radiologist assistants; further providing for licenses and certificates and general qualification; repealing provisions relating to radiologic procedures and education and training required; and making related and inconsistent repeals.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-09 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - House - House Floor: HB 1440 PN 2716, FP (Y: 132 N: 67 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-07 - House - House Floor: HB 1440 PN 2642, 2021 A3595 (Y: 200 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-24 - House - House Professional Licensure: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-24 - House - House Professional Licensure: Adopt Amendment A03448 (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - House - House Floor: HB 1440 PN 2716, FP (Y: 132 N: 67 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-07 - House - House Floor: HB 1440 PN 2642, 2021 A3595 (Y: 200 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-24 - House - House Professional Licensure: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-24 - House - House Professional Licensure: Adopt Amendment A03448 (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-14 | Senate | Referred to CONSUMER PROTECTION AND PROFESSIONAL LICENSURE |
2022-02-09 | Senate | In the Senate |
2022-02-09 | House | Third consideration and final passage (132-67) |
2022-02-09 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2022-02-07 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2022-02-07 | House | Second consideration, with amendments |
2022-01-26 | House | Removed from table |
2022-01-24 | House | Laid on the table |
2022-01-24 | House | First consideration |
2022-01-24 | House | Reported as amended |
2021-05-17 | House | Referred to PROFESSIONAL LICENSURE |