PA HB1436 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 24-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 13 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-06-15 - Referred to JUDICIARY
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 13 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-06-15 - Referred to JUDICIARY
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An Act amending Titles 18 (Crimes and Offenses) and 42 (Judiciary and Judicial Procedure) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, providing for restitution for official oppression; further providing for the offense of official oppression; and providing for sentencing for official oppression.
Title
Providing for restitution for official oppression; further providing for the offense of official oppression; and providing for sentencing for official oppression.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-06-13 - House - HB 1436 PN 1943, FP (Y: 169 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-15 | Senate | Referred to JUDICIARY |
2011-06-13 | Senate | In the Senate |
2011-06-13 | House | Third consideration and final passage (169-32) |
2011-06-13 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2011-06-08 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2011-06-08 | House | Second consideration |
2011-06-07 | House | Removed from table |
2011-05-24 | House | Laid on the table |
2011-05-24 | House | First consideration |
2011-05-24 | House | Reported as amended |
2011-05-03 | House | Referred to JUDICIARY |