PA HB1431 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 18-2)
Status: Passed on June 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-30 - Act No. 49
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending Title 18 (Crimes and Offenses) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in assault, further providing for the offense of abuse of care-dependent person.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In assault, further providing for the offense of abuse of care-dependent person.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-06-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 1431 PN 1547, Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-23 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Reported as Committed (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-15 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-15 - House - House Floor: HB 1431 PN 1547, FP (Y: 198 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-07 - House - House Aging And Older Adult Services: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-30SenateAct No. 49
2021-06-30SenateApproved by the Governor
2021-06-28SenatePresented to the Governor
2021-06-25SenateSigned in Senate
2021-06-25SenateSigned in House
2021-06-25SenateThird consideration and final passage (48-2)
2021-06-24SenateSecond consideration
2021-06-23SenateFirst consideration
2021-06-23SenateReported as committed
2021-06-17SenateReferred to JUDICIARY
2021-06-15SenateIn the Senate
2021-06-15HouseThird consideration and final passage (198-4)
2021-06-15HouseRe-reported as committed
2021-06-14HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2021-06-14HouseSecond consideration
2021-06-09HouseRemoved from table
2021-06-07HouseLaid on the table
2021-06-07HouseFirst consideration
2021-06-07HouseReported as committed
2021-05-17HouseReferred to AGING AND OLDER ADULT SERVICES

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2021&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=1431
Texthttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2021&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=1431&pn=1547
Supplementhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/WU01/LI/BI/FN/2021/0/HB1431P1547.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2021&sInd=0&cteeCde=32&theDate=06/07/2021&RollCallId=536
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2021&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=339
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2021&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=06/15/2021&RollCallId=650
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2021&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=39&theDate=06/23/2021&RollCallId=420
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2021&sess_ind=0&rc_body=S&rc_nbr=248

Bill Comments 750

feedback