PA HB143 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 23-3)
Status: Passed on July 7 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-07 - Act No. 34
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 23-3)
Status: Passed on July 7 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-07 - Act No. 34
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An Act amending the act of December 19, 1974 (P.L.973, No.319), known as the Pennsylvania Farmland and Forest Land Assessment Act of 1974, further providing for split-off, separation or transfer, leasing for wireless service, utilization of land or conveyance of rights for exploration or extraction of gas, oil or coal bed methane, utilization of land for commercial alternative energy generation, death of landowner and temporary leases.
Title
Further providing for split-off, separation or transfer, leasing for wireless service, utilization of land or conveyance of rights for exploration or extraction of gas, oil or coal bed methane, utilization of land for commercial alternative energy generation, death of landowner and temporary leases.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-06-23 - Senate - HB 143 PN 317, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 47 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-21 - Senate - Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 19 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-24 - Senate - Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-15 - House - HB 143 PN 317, FP (Y: 148 N: 52 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-06-21 - Senate - Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 19 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-24 - Senate - Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-15 - House - HB 143 PN 317, FP (Y: 148 N: 52 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-07-07 | Senate | Act No. 34 |
2011-07-07 | Senate | Approved by the Governor |
2011-06-27 | Senate | Presented to the Governor |
2011-06-26 | Senate | Signed in Senate |
2011-06-24 | Senate | Signed in House |
2011-06-23 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (47-3) |
2011-06-22 | Senate | Second consideration |
2011-06-21 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2011-06-07 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2011-05-24 | Senate | First consideration |
2011-05-24 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2011-02-28 | Senate | Referred to AGRICULTURE AND RURAL AFFAIRS |
2011-02-15 | Senate | In the Senate |
2011-02-15 | House | Third consideration and final passage (148-52) |
2011-02-15 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2011-02-14 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2011-02-14 | House | Second consideration |
2011-02-09 | House | Removed from table |
2011-02-08 | House | Laid on the table |
2011-02-08 | House | First consideration |
2011-02-08 | House | Reported as committed |
2011-02-01 | House | Referred to AGRICULTURE AND RURAL AFFAIRS |