PA HB1411 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on June 7 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-06-09 - Referred to TRANSPORTATION
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 7 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-06-09 - Referred to TRANSPORTATION
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act designating a portion of State Route 18 in West Fallowfield Township, Crawford County as the Staff Sergeant James Douglas Mowris Memorial Highway.
Title
Designating a portion of State Route 18 in West Fallowfield Township, Crawford County as the Staff Sergeant James Douglas Mowris Memorial Highway.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-07 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-07 - House - House Floor: HB 1411 PN 1776, FP (Y: 194 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2017-05-24 - House - House Transportation: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-07 - House - House Floor: HB 1411 PN 1776, FP (Y: 194 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2017-05-24 - House - House Transportation: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-09 | Senate | Referred to TRANSPORTATION |
2017-06-07 | Senate | In the Senate |
2017-06-07 | House | Third consideration and final passage (194-0) |
2017-06-07 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2017-06-06 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2017-06-06 | House | Second consideration |
2017-06-05 | House | Removed from table |
2017-05-24 | House | Laid on the table |
2017-05-24 | House | First consideration |
2017-05-24 | House | Reported as committed |
2017-05-19 | House | Referred to TRANSPORTATION |