PA HB1411 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on December 20 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-12-20 - Act No. 88
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on December 20 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-12-20 - Act No. 88
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Title 26 (Eminent Domain) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in special damages for displacement, further providing for moving and related expenses of displaced persons, for replacement housing for homeowners and for replacement housing for tenants and others.
Title
In special damages for displacement, further providing for moving and related expenses of displaced persons, for replacement housing for homeowners and for replacement housing for tenants and others.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-12-10 - House - House Rules: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-12-10 - House - House Rules: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-12-10 - House - House Floor: HB 1411 PN 2397, CONCUR (Y: 197 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2015-11-18 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 1411 PN 2397, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-10-20 - Senate - Senate Transportation: Reported as Amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-10-20 - Senate - Senate Transportation: Reported as Amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-10-05 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-10-05 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-10-05 - House - House Floor: HB 1411 PN 1968, FP (Y: 195 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2015-06-30 - House - House Transportation: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-30 - House - House Transportation: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-12-10 - House - House Rules: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-12-10 - House - House Floor: HB 1411 PN 2397, CONCUR (Y: 197 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2015-11-18 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 1411 PN 2397, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-10-20 - Senate - Senate Transportation: Reported as Amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-10-20 - Senate - Senate Transportation: Reported as Amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-10-05 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-10-05 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-10-05 - House - House Floor: HB 1411 PN 1968, FP (Y: 195 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2015-06-30 - House - House Transportation: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-30 - House - House Transportation: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-12-20 | House | Act No. 88 |
2015-12-20 | House | Approved by the Governor |
2015-12-10 | House | Presented to the Governor |
2015-12-10 | House | Signed in Senate |
2015-12-10 | House | Signed in House |
2015-12-10 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments (197-0) |
2015-12-10 | House | Re-reported on concurrence, as committed |
2015-11-18 | House | Referred to RULES |
2015-11-18 | House | In the House |
2015-11-18 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (49-0) |
2015-10-26 | Senate | Second consideration |
2015-10-20 | Senate | First consideration |
2015-10-20 | Senate | Reported as amended |
2015-10-14 | Senate | Referred to TRANSPORTATION |
2015-10-05 | Senate | In the Senate |
2015-10-05 | House | Third consideration and final passage (195-0) |
2015-10-05 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2015-09-30 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2015-09-30 | House | Second consideration |
2015-09-29 | House | Removed from table |
2015-09-21 | House | Laid on the table |
2015-09-21 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2015-06-30 | House | Re-committed to RULES |
2015-06-30 | House | First consideration |
2015-06-30 | House | Reported as committed |
2015-06-28 | House | Corrective Reprint, Printer's No. 1968 |
2015-06-25 | House | Referred to TRANSPORTATION |