PA HB1411 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 37-4)
Status: Engrossed on May 25 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-06-03 - Referred to EDUCATION
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 25 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-06-03 - Referred to EDUCATION
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An Act amending the act of March 10, 1949 (P.L.30, No.14), known as the Public School Code of 1949, in school districts, providing for moratorium on certain data collection systems and data sets.
Title
In school districts, providing for moratorium on certain data collection systems and data sets.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-05-25 - House - HB 1411 PN 1959, FP (Y: 199 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-05-24 - House - HB 1411 PN 1685, 2011 A2355, ELLIS (Y: 201 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-05-24 - House - HB 1411 PN 1685, 2011 A2355, ELLIS (Y: 201 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-03 | Senate | Referred to EDUCATION |
2011-05-25 | Senate | In the Senate |
2011-05-25 | House | Third consideration and final passage (199-0) |
2011-05-25 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2011-05-24 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2011-05-24 | House | Second consideration, with amendments |
2011-05-11 | House | Removed from table |
2011-05-04 | House | Laid on the table |
2011-05-04 | House | First consideration |
2011-05-04 | House | Reported as committed |
2011-04-28 | House | Referred to EDUCATION |