PA HB1409 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 7 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-10 - Referred to LABOR AND INDUSTRY
Pending: Senate Labor & Industry Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 7 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-10 - Referred to LABOR AND INDUSTRY
Pending: Senate Labor & Industry Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of November 10, 1999 (P.L.491, No.45), known as the Pennsylvania Construction Code Act, in adoption and enforcement by municipalities, further providing for administration and enforcement.
Title
In adoption and enforcement by municipalities, further providing for administration and enforcement.
Sponsors
Rep. Kathy Rapp [R] | Rep. Tina Pickett [R] | Rep. Robert Kauffman [R] | Rep. Jim Cox [R] |
Rep. Dan Truitt [R] | Rep. David Zimmerman [R] | Rep. David Millard [R] | Rep. Jack Rader [R] |
Rep. Matthew Gabler [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-06-07 - House - House Floor: HB 1409 PN 3019, FP (Y: 186 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2016-06-06 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-23 - House - House Local Government: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-23 - House - House Local Government: Adopt Amendment A06264 (Y: 0 N: 15 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-03-23 - House - House Local Government: Adopt Amendment A05888 (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-06 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-23 - House - House Local Government: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-23 - House - House Local Government: Adopt Amendment A06264 (Y: 0 N: 15 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-03-23 - House - House Local Government: Adopt Amendment A05888 (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-10 | Senate | Referred to LABOR AND INDUSTRY |
2016-06-07 | Senate | In the Senate |
2016-06-07 | House | Third consideration and final passage (186-0) |
2016-06-06 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2016-05-25 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2016-05-25 | House | Second consideration |
2016-04-04 | House | Removed from table |
2016-03-23 | House | Laid on the table |
2016-03-23 | House | First consideration |
2016-03-23 | House | Reported as amended |
2015-06-28 | House | Referred to LOCAL GOVERNMENT |