PA HB1402 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 24-11)
Status: Engrossed on October 2 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-10-05 - Referred to TRANSPORTATION
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on October 2 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-10-05 - Referred to TRANSPORTATION
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act designating a portion of State Route 1001 in Greene Township, Franklin County, as the Lance Corporal Michael L. Freeman, Jr., Memorial Highway; designating a bridge on that portion of State Route 533 over Muddy Run, Southampton Township, Franklin County, as the Private First Class Dana Edward Diehl Memorial Bridge; and designating a bridge on that portion of State Route 1004 over the Conococheague Creek, Greene Township, Franklin County, as the Private Charles W. "Bill" Roher Memorial Bridge.
Title
Designating a portion of State Route 1001 in Greene Township, Franklin County, as the Lance Corporal Michael L. Freeman, Jr., Memorial Highway; designating a bridge on that portion of State Route 533 over Muddy Run, Southampton Township, Franklin County, as the Private First Class Dana Edward Diehl Memorial Bridge; and designating a bridge on that portion of State Route 1004 over the Conococheague Creek, Greene Township, Franklin County, as the Private Charles W. "Bill" Roher Memorial Bridge.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-10-02 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-10-02 - House - House Floor: HB 1402 PN 2465, FP (Y: 188 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2017-09-25 - House - House Transportation: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-25 - House - House Transportation: Adopt Amendment A03406 (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-10-02 - House - House Floor: HB 1402 PN 2465, FP (Y: 188 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2017-09-25 - House - House Transportation: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-25 - House - House Transportation: Adopt Amendment A03406 (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-10-05 | Senate | Referred to TRANSPORTATION |
2017-10-02 | Senate | In the Senate |
2017-10-02 | House | Third consideration and final passage (188-0) |
2017-10-02 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2017-09-27 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2017-09-27 | House | Second consideration |
2017-09-26 | House | Removed from table |
2017-09-25 | House | Laid on the table |
2017-09-25 | House | First consideration |
2017-09-25 | House | Reported as amended |
2017-05-18 | House | Referred to TRANSPORTATION |