PA HB1342 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on November 25 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-11-25 - Act No. 122
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending the act of March 10, 1949 (P.L.30, No.14), known as the Public School Code of 1949, in school health services, further providing for health services and providing for vision screening and examinations.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In school health services, further providing for health services and providing for vision screening and examinations.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-11-18 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-11-18 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 1342 PN 4576, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-11-16 - Senate - Senate Education: Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-21 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-21 - House - House Floor: HB 1342 PN 4576, FP (Y: 201 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-10-20 - House - House Floor: HB 1342 PN 4465, 2019 A7733, APPEAL CHAIR, A. DAVIS (Y: 109 N: 93 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-20 - House - House Floor: HB 1342 PN 4465, 2019 A7650, BROWN (Y: 202 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-01 - House - House Education: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 18 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-01 - House - House Education: Adopt Amendment A07502 (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-11-25SenateAct No. 122
2020-11-25SenateApproved by the Governor
2020-11-19SenatePresented to the Governor
2020-11-19SenateSigned in Senate
2020-11-19SenateSigned in House
2020-11-18SenateThird consideration and final passage (49-0)
2020-11-18SenateRe-reported as committed
2020-11-17SenateRe-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
2020-11-17SenateSecond consideration
2020-11-16SenateFirst consideration
2020-11-16SenateReported as committed
2020-10-26SenateReferred to EDUCATION
2020-10-21SenateIn the Senate
2020-10-21HouseThird consideration and final passage (201-0)
2020-10-21HouseRe-reported as committed
2020-10-20HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2020-10-20HouseSecond consideration, with amendments
2020-10-19HouseRemoved from table
2020-10-01HouseLaid on the table
2020-10-01HouseFirst consideration
2020-10-01HouseReported as amended
2019-04-29HouseReferred to EDUCATION

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2019&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=1342
Texthttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=1342&pn=1605
Texthttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=1342&pn=4465
Texthttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=1342&pn=4576
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=12&theDate=10/01/2020&RollCallId=2565
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=12&theDate=10/01/2020&RollCallId=2566
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=1677
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=1678
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=1700
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=10/21/2020&RollCallId=2605
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=23&theDate=11/16/2020&RollCallId=1278
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=S&rc_nbr=753
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=3&theDate=11/18/2020&RollCallId=1290

Bill Comments

feedback