PA HB1332 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 12-0)
Status: Introduced on June 7 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-09-22 - Re-committed to RULES
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 7 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-09-22 - Re-committed to RULES
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of June 3, 1937 (P.L.1333, No.320), known as the Pennsylvania Election Code, in provisions relating to the Secretary of the Commonwealth, further providing for powers and duties of the Secretary of the Commonwealth and for explanation of ballot question; and, in ballots, further providing for form of official election ballot.
Title
In provisions relating to the Secretary of the Commonwealth, further providing for powers and duties of the Secretary of the Commonwealth and for explanation of ballot question; and, in ballots, further providing for form of official election ballot.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-06-28 - House - House State Government: Adopt Amendment A01457 (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-28 - House - House State Government: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-28 - House - House State Government: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-09-22 | House | Re-committed to RULES |
2023-09-22 | House | Removed from table |
2023-09-22 | House | Laid on the table |
2023-09-22 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2023-06-28 | House | Re-committed to RULES |
2023-06-28 | House | First consideration |
2023-06-28 | House | Reported as amended |
2023-06-07 | House | Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT |