PA HB1330 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 86-32)
Status: Engrossed on May 10 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-06-30 - Referred to RULES
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 10 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-06-30 - Referred to RULES
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An Act amending the act of March 10, 1949 (P.L.30, No.14), known as the Public School Code of 1949, in preliminary provisions, establishing the Special Education Funding Commission; in terms and courses of study, further providing for agreements with institutions of higher education and for definitions; in opportunities for educational excellence, further providing for concurrent enrollment agreements; extensively revising charter school provisions; establishing an educational opportunity scholarship tax credit; in reimbursements by Commonwealth and between school districts, further providing for definitions and providing for special education funding for student achievement and instruction of eligible students, for special education funding for eligible students with disabilities in Category 3, for special education accountability, for data collection and for protections; providing for educational improvement tax credit; repealing provisions of the Tax Reform Code of 1971 relating to educational improvement tax credit; and providing for distribution of certain appropriated funds to the Department of Education for regional community college services.
Title
In preliminary provisions, establishing the Special Education Funding Commission; in terms and courses of study, further providing for agreements with institutions of higher education and for definitions; in opportunities for educational excellence, further providing for concurrent enrollment agreements; extensively revising charter school provisions; establishing an educational opportunity scholarship tax credit; in reimbursements by Commonwealth and between school districts, further providing for definitions and providing for special education funding for student achievement and instruction of eligible students, for special education funding for eligible students with disabilities in Category 3, for special education accountability, for data collection and for protections; providing for educational improvement tax credit; repealing provisions of the Tax Reform Code of 1971 relating to educational improvement tax credit; and providing for distribution of certain appropriated funds to the Department of Education for regional community college services.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-06-30 - Senate - HB 1330 PN 3892, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-30 - Senate - Re-Reported as Amended (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-26 - Senate - Reported as Amended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-10 - House - HB 1330 PN 1749, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 190 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2011-05-09 - House - HB 1330 PN 1749, 2011 A1870, CONKLIN (Y: 80 N: 109 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [FAIL]
2011-05-09 - House - HB 1330 PN 1749, 2011 A1860, MUNDY (Y: 74 N: 115 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [FAIL]
2011-05-09 - House - HB 1330 PN 1749, 2011 A1859, MUNDY (Y: 77 N: 112 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [FAIL]
2011-05-09 - House - HB 1330 PN 1749, 2011 A1838, MUNDY (Y: 80 N: 111 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [FAIL]
2011-05-09 - House - HB 1330 PN 1749, 2011 A1865, STURLA (Y: 77 N: 112 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [FAIL]
2012-06-30 - Senate - Re-Reported as Amended (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-26 - Senate - Reported as Amended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-10 - House - HB 1330 PN 1749, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 190 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2011-05-09 - House - HB 1330 PN 1749, 2011 A1870, CONKLIN (Y: 80 N: 109 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [FAIL]
2011-05-09 - House - HB 1330 PN 1749, 2011 A1860, MUNDY (Y: 74 N: 115 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [FAIL]
2011-05-09 - House - HB 1330 PN 1749, 2011 A1859, MUNDY (Y: 77 N: 112 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [FAIL]
2011-05-09 - House - HB 1330 PN 1749, 2011 A1838, MUNDY (Y: 80 N: 111 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [FAIL]
2011-05-09 - House - HB 1330 PN 1749, 2011 A1865, STURLA (Y: 77 N: 112 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-30 | House | Referred to RULES |
2012-06-30 | House | In the House |
2012-06-30 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (49-0) |
2012-06-30 | Senate | Re-reported as amended |
2012-06-27 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2012-06-27 | Senate | Second consideration |
2012-06-26 | Senate | First consideration |
2012-06-26 | Senate | Reported as amended |
2011-06-07 | Senate | Referred to EDUCATION |
2011-05-10 | Senate | In the Senate |
2011-05-10 | House | Third consideration and final passage (190-7) |
2011-05-10 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2011-05-09 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2011-05-09 | House | Second consideration |
2011-05-04 | House | Re-reported as amended |
2011-05-03 | House | Amended in House Committee on EDUCATION |
2011-05-02 | House | Re-committed to EDUCATION |
2011-04-27 | House | Removed from table |
2011-04-26 | House | Laid on the table |
2011-04-26 | House | First consideration |
2011-04-26 | House | Reported as amended |
2011-04-11 | House | Referred to EDUCATION |