PA HB1319 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 27-15)
Status: Engrossed on June 24 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-13 - Referred to RULES
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 24 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-13 - Referred to RULES
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act providing for the taxation or the exemption from taxation of amounts and events relating to the Pennsylvania ABLE Savings Program.
Title
Providing for the taxation or the exemption from taxation of amounts and events relating to the Pennsylvania ABLE Savings Program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-12 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 1319 PN 3001, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-15 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-09-29 - Senate - Senate Finance: Reported as Amended (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-09-29 - Senate - Senate Finance: Reported as Amended (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-24 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-24 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-24 - House - House Floor: HB 1319 PN 1879, FP (Y: 193 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-06-23 - House - House Rules: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-23 - House - House Rules: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-23 - House - House Floor: HB 1319 PN 1767, 2015 A2337, MARSHALL (Y: 194 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-06-16 - House - House Finance: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-16 - House - House Finance: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-15 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-09-29 - Senate - Senate Finance: Reported as Amended (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-09-29 - Senate - Senate Finance: Reported as Amended (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-24 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-24 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-24 - House - House Floor: HB 1319 PN 1879, FP (Y: 193 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-06-23 - House - House Rules: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-23 - House - House Rules: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-23 - House - House Floor: HB 1319 PN 1767, 2015 A2337, MARSHALL (Y: 194 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-06-16 - House - House Finance: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-16 - House - House Finance: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-13 | House | Referred to RULES |
2016-04-12 | House | In the House |
2016-04-12 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (49-0) |
2016-03-21 | Senate | Amended on third consideration |
2016-03-15 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2015-09-30 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2015-09-30 | Senate | Second consideration |
2015-09-29 | Senate | First consideration |
2015-09-29 | Senate | Reported as amended |
2015-06-29 | Senate | Referred to FINANCE |
2015-06-24 | Senate | In the Senate |
2015-06-24 | House | Third consideration and final passage (193-1) |
2015-06-24 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2015-06-23 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2015-06-23 | House | Second consideration, with amendments |
2015-06-23 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2015-06-16 | House | Re-committed to RULES |
2015-06-16 | House | First consideration |
2015-06-16 | House | Reported as committed |
2015-06-10 | House | Referred to FINANCE |