PA HB1281 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 8 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-17 - Referred to TRANSPORTATION
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act designating the bridge identified as Bridge Key 3522 on that portion of Interstate 376 over the Ohio River in Vanport Township, Beaver County, as the Richard L. Shaw Memorial Bridge.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Designating the bridge identified as Bridge Key 3522 on that portion of Interstate 376 over the Ohio River in Vanport Township, Beaver County, as the Richard L. Shaw Memorial Bridge.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-08 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-08 - House - House Floor: HB 1281 PN 1549, FP (Y: 197 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-04-29 - House - House Transportation: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-17SenateReferred to TRANSPORTATION
2019-05-08SenateIn the Senate
2019-05-08HouseThird consideration and final passage (197-0)
2019-05-08HouseRe-reported as committed
2019-05-07HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2019-05-07HouseSecond consideration
2019-05-06HouseRemoved from table
2019-04-30HouseLaid on the table
2019-04-30HouseFirst consideration
2019-04-30HouseReported as committed
2019-04-25HouseReferred to TRANSPORTATION

Pennsylvania State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback