PA HB1267 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-1)
Status: Engrossed on June 12 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-06-26 - Referred to FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 12 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-06-26 - Referred to FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of April 3, 1992 (P.L.28, No.11), known as the Tuition Account Programs and College Savings Bond Act, in tuition account program, further providing for declaration of policy, for definitions, for Tuition Account Programs Bureau, for powers of department, for Tuition Account Guaranteed Savings Program, for Tuition Account Investment Program, for general provisions governing both tuition account programs and for Federal taxation; establishing the Keystone Scholars Grant Program and the Keystone Scholars Grant Program Account; and making a repeal.
Title
In tuition account program, further providing for declaration of policy, for definitions, for Tuition Account Programs Bureau, for powers of department, for Tuition Account Guaranteed Savings Program, for Tuition Account Investment Program, for general provisions governing both tuition account programs and for Federal taxation; establishing the Keystone Scholars Grant Program and the Keystone Scholars Grant Program Account; and making a repeal.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-06-12 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-12 - House - House Floor: HB 1267 PN 1376, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 203 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-07 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-06 - House - House Finance: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-12 - House - House Floor: HB 1267 PN 1376, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 203 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-07 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-06 - House - House Finance: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-26 | Senate | Referred to FINANCE |
2023-06-12 | Senate | In the Senate |
2023-06-12 | House | Third consideration and final passage (203-0) |
2023-06-12 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2023-06-07 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2023-06-07 | House | Second consideration |
2023-06-07 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2023-06-06 | House | Re-committed to RULES |
2023-06-06 | House | First consideration |
2023-06-06 | House | Reported as committed |
2023-05-30 | House | Referred to FINANCE |