PA HB1243 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-2)
Status: Engrossed on September 25 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-10-08 - Referred to COMMUNITY, ECONOMIC AND RECREATIONAL DEVELOPMENT
Pending: Senate Community, Economic & Recreational Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending the act of April 23, 2002 (P.L.298, No.39), known as the Main Street Act, further providing for the duration of grants.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Further providing for the duration of grants.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-09-25 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-25 - House - House Floor: HB 1243 PN 1447, FP (Y: 199 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-05-06 - House - House Local Government: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-10-08SenateReferred to COMMUNITY, ECONOMIC AND RECREATIONAL DEVELOPMENT
2019-09-25SenateIn the Senate
2019-09-25HouseThird consideration and final passage (199-0)
2019-09-25HouseRe-reported as committed
2019-09-24HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2019-09-24HouseSecond consideration
2019-09-23HouseRemoved from table
2019-06-18HouseLaid on the table
2019-06-18HouseRemoved from table
2019-05-06HouseLaid on the table
2019-05-06HouseFirst consideration
2019-05-06HouseReported as committed
2019-04-16HouseReferred to LOCAL GOVERNMENT

Pennsylvania State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback