PA HB124 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-01 - Act No. 15
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act designating a bridge, identified as Bridge Key 8680, carrying State Route 3055 over Stonycreek River in the City of Johnstown, Cambria County, as the City of Johnstown Firefighters Memorial Bridge.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Designating a bridge, identified as Bridge Key 8680, carrying State Route 3055 over Stonycreek River in the City of Johnstown, Cambria County, as the City of Johnstown Firefighters Memorial Bridge.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-24 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-24 - House - House Floor: HB 124 PN 1324, CONCUR (Y: 201 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-10 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 124 PN 1324, Final Passage (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-20 - Senate - Senate Transportation: Reported as Amended (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - House - House Floor: HB 124 PN 91, FP (Y: 202 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - House - House Transportation: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-01HouseAct No. 15
2021-06-01HouseApproved by the Governor
2021-05-26HousePresented to the Governor
2021-05-25HouseSigned in Senate
2021-05-24HouseSigned in House
2021-05-24HouseHouse concurred in Senate amendments (201-0)
2021-05-24HouseRe-reported on concurrence, as committed
2021-05-24HouseReferred to RULES
2021-05-10HouseIn the House
2021-05-10SenateThird consideration and final passage (47-0)
2021-04-21SenateSecond consideration
2021-04-20SenateFirst consideration
2021-04-20SenateReported as amended
2021-03-18SenateReferred to TRANSPORTATION
2021-03-16SenateIn the Senate
2021-03-16HouseThird consideration and final passage (202-0)
2021-03-16HouseRe-reported as committed
2021-03-15HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2021-03-15HouseSecond consideration
2021-02-05HouseRemoved from table
2021-02-04HouseLaid on the table
2021-02-04HouseFirst consideration
2021-02-04HouseReported as committed
2021-01-12HouseReferred to TRANSPORTATION

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2021&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=124
Texthttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2021&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0124&pn=0091
Texthttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2021&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0124&pn=1324
Supplementhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/WU01/LI/BI/FN/2021/0/HB0124P0091.pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/WU01/LI/BI/FN/2021/0/HB0124P1324.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2021&sInd=0&cteeCde=38&theDate=02/04/2021&RollCallId=75
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2021&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=60
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2021&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=03/16/2021&RollCallId=163
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2021&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=19&theDate=04/20/2021&RollCallId=120
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2021&sess_ind=0&rc_body=S&rc_nbr=96
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2021&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=220
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2021&sInd=0&cteeCde=44&theDate=05/24/2021&RollCallId=427

Bill Comments

feedback