PA HB1238 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 28 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-28 - Act No. 10
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 28 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-28 - Act No. 10
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Titles 3 (Agriculture), 18 (Crimes and Offenses), 22 (Detectives and Private Police), 34 (Game) and 42 (Judiciary and Judicial Procedure) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in race horse industry reform, further providing for licenses for horse race meetings and for occupational licenses for individuals; in riot, disorderly conduct and related offenses, repealing provisions relating to offense of cruelty to animals, live animals as prizes prohibited, police animals and assault with a biological agent on animal, fowl or honey bees and providing for offenses relating to cruelty to animals; in humane society police officers, further providing for definitions, for appointment by nonprofit corporations, for qualifications for appointment, for suspension, revocation, limitation and restriction of appointment and restoration of appointment, for powers and authority and jurisdiction, for search warrants and for costs; in hunting and furtaking, further providing for destruction of dogs declared public nuisances; in budget and finance, further providing for municipal corporation portion of fines, etc; and making editorial changes.
Title
In race horse industry reform, further providing for licenses for horse race meetings and for occupational licenses for individuals; in riot, disorderly conduct and related offenses, repealing provisions relating to offense of cruelty to animals, live animals as prizes prohibited, police animals and assault with a biological agent on animal, fowl or honey bees and providing for offenses relating to cruelty to animals; in humane society police officers, further providing for definitions, for appointment by nonprofit corporations, for qualifications for appointment, for suspension, revocation, limitation and restriction of appointment and restoration of appointment, for powers and authority and jurisdiction, for search warrants and for costs; in hunting and furtaking, further providing for destruction of dogs declared public nuisances; in budget and finance, further providing for municipal corporation portion of fines, etc; and making editorial changes.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-20 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 1238 PN 1565, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-19 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-13 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Reported as Committed (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - House - House Floor: HB 1238 PN 1565, FP (Y: 167 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - House - House Floor: HB 1238 PN 1465, 2017 A931, MARSICO (Y: 191 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - House - House Floor: HB 1238 PN 1465, 2017 A766, MARSICO (Y: 191 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - House - House Floor: HB 1238 PN 1465, 2017 A932, KNOWLES (Y: 65 N: 126 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [FAIL]
2017-04-19 - House - House Judiciary: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 23 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-19 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-13 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Reported as Committed (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - House - House Floor: HB 1238 PN 1565, FP (Y: 167 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - House - House Floor: HB 1238 PN 1465, 2017 A931, MARSICO (Y: 191 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - House - House Floor: HB 1238 PN 1465, 2017 A766, MARSICO (Y: 191 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - House - House Floor: HB 1238 PN 1465, 2017 A932, KNOWLES (Y: 65 N: 126 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [FAIL]
2017-04-19 - House - House Judiciary: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 23 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-28 | Senate | Act No. 10 |
2017-06-28 | Senate | Approved by the Governor |
2017-06-21 | Senate | Presented to the Governor |
2017-06-21 | Senate | Signed in Senate |
2017-06-21 | Senate | Signed in House |
2017-06-20 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (49-0) |
2017-06-19 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2017-06-14 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2017-06-14 | Senate | Second consideration |
2017-06-13 | Senate | First consideration |
2017-06-13 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Referred to JUDICIARY |
2017-04-26 | Senate | In the Senate |
2017-04-26 | House | Third consideration and final passage (167-20) |
2017-04-26 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2017-04-25 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2017-04-25 | House | Second consideration, with amendments |
2017-04-19 | House | Removed from table |
2017-04-19 | House | Laid on the table |
2017-04-19 | House | First consideration |
2017-04-19 | House | Reported as committed |
2017-04-17 | House | Referred to JUDICIARY |