PA HB1234 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on December 22 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-12-22 - Act No. 70
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending the act of July 19, 1979 (P.L.130, No.48), known as the Health Care Facilities Act, in licensing of health care facilities, further providing for definitions; and abrogating regulations.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In licensing of health care facilities, further providing for definitions; and abrogating regulations.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-12-12 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 1234 PN 1461, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-11 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-11-14 - Senate - Senate Health And Human Services: Reported as Committed (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-07 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-07 - House - House Floor: HB 1234 PN 1461, FP (Y: 192 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2017-06-29 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-26 - House - House Health: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-12-22SenateAct No. 70
2017-12-22SenateApproved by the Governor
2017-12-13SenatePresented to the Governor
2017-12-13SenateSigned in Senate
2017-12-12SenateSigned in House
2017-12-12SenateThird consideration and final passage (50-0)
2017-12-11SenateRe-reported as committed
2017-11-15SenateRe-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
2017-11-15SenateSecond consideration
2017-11-14SenateFirst consideration
2017-11-14SenateReported as committed
2017-07-14SenateReferred to HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
2017-07-07SenateIn the Senate
2017-07-07HouseThird consideration and final passage (192-0)
2017-07-07HouseRe-reported as committed
2017-06-29HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2017-06-29HouseSecond consideration
2017-06-29HouseRe-reported as committed
2017-06-26HouseRe-committed to RULES
2017-06-26HouseFirst consideration
2017-06-26HouseReported as committed
2017-04-17HouseReferred to HEALTH

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2017&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=1234
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=1234&pn=1461
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=55&theDate=06/26/2017&RollCallId=723
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=44&theDate=06/29/2017&RollCallId=812
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=619
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=07/07/2017&RollCallId=842
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=33&theDate=11/14/2017&RollCallId=540
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=3&theDate=12/11/2017&RollCallId=574
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=S&rc_nbr=366

Bill Comments

feedback