PA HB1225 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on December 18 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-12-18 - Act No. 110
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on December 18 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-12-18 - Act No. 110
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Title 45 (Legal Notices) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in codification and publication of documents, providing for electronic publication of municipal codes; and making an inconsistent repeal.
Title
In codification and publication of documents, providing for electronic publication of municipal codes; and making an inconsistent repeal.
Sponsors
Rep. Chris Ross [R] | Rep. Mauree Gingrich [R] | Rep. Kate Harper [R] | Rep. Robert Freeman [D] |
Rep. Mary Jo Daley [D] |
Roll Calls
2013-12-03 - Senate - HB 1225 PN 1832, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-11-18 - Senate - Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-18 - Senate - Reported as Committed (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-05 - House - HB 1225 PN 1832, FP (Y: 193 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2013-11-18 - Senate - Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-18 - Senate - Reported as Committed (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-05 - House - HB 1225 PN 1832, FP (Y: 193 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-12-18 | Senate | Act No. 110 |
2013-12-18 | Senate | Approved by the Governor |
2013-12-10 | Senate | Presented to the Governor |
2013-12-09 | Senate | Signed in Senate |
2013-12-09 | Senate | Signed in House |
2013-12-03 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (48-0) |
2013-11-19 | Senate | Second consideration |
2013-11-18 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2013-06-24 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2013-06-18 | Senate | First consideration |
2013-06-18 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2013-06-07 | Senate | Referred to LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2013-06-05 | Senate | In the Senate |
2013-06-05 | House | Third consideration and final passage (193-0) |
2013-06-05 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2013-06-04 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2013-06-04 | House | Second consideration |
2013-06-03 | House | Removed from table |
2013-05-15 | House | Laid on the table |
2013-05-15 | House | First consideration |
2013-05-15 | House | Reported as amended |
2013-04-22 | House | Referred to LOCAL GOVERNMENT |