PA HB1205 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on April 16 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-12-17 - Laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 16 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-12-17 - Laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of August 26, 1971 (P.L.351, No.91), known as the State Lottery Law, further providing for statement of purpose, for powers and duties of secretary and for disposition of funds; and providing for instant lottery game to benefit veterans.
Title
Further providing for statement of purpose, for powers and duties of secretary and for disposition of funds; and providing for instant lottery game to benefit veterans.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-12-17 | House | Laid on the table |
2013-12-17 | House | Removed from table |
2013-10-21 | House | Laid on the table |
2013-10-21 | House | First consideration |
2013-10-21 | House | Reported as committed |
2013-04-16 | House | Referred to VETERANS AFFAIRS AND EMERGENCY PREPAREDNESS |