PA HB1199 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 23 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-23 - Act No. 49
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 23 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-23 - Act No. 49
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act repealing the act of May 27, 1965 (P.L.63, No.50), entitled "An act authorizing the Department of Highways, with the approval of the Governor, to erect and maintain a bridge over the Monongahela River in Washington and Allegheny Counties, and to provide the necessary approaches and connections with State highways; empowering counties to pay certain damages, and making an appropriation."
Title
Repealing the act of May 27, 1965 (P.L.63, No.50), entitled "An act authorizing the Department of Highways, with the approval of the Governor, to erect and maintain a bridge over the Monongahela River in Washington and Allegheny Counties, and to provide the necessary approaches and connections with State highways; empowering counties to pay certain damages, and making an appropriation."
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-06-14 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 1199 PN 1574, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-20 - Senate - Senate Transportation: Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-20 - Senate - Senate Transportation: Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-12-02 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-12-02 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-12-02 - House - House Floor: HB 1199 PN 1574, FP (Y: 188 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2015-11-23 - House - House Transportation: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-11-23 - House - House Transportation: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-20 - Senate - Senate Transportation: Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-20 - Senate - Senate Transportation: Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-12-02 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-12-02 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-12-02 - House - House Floor: HB 1199 PN 1574, FP (Y: 188 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2015-11-23 - House - House Transportation: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-11-23 - House - House Transportation: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-23 | Senate | Act No. 49 |
2016-06-23 | Senate | Approved by the Governor |
2016-06-16 | Senate | Presented to the Governor |
2016-06-15 | Senate | Signed in Senate |
2016-06-15 | Senate | Signed in House |
2016-06-14 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (48-0) |
2016-05-09 | Senate | Removed from table |
2016-03-22 | Senate | Laid on the table (Pursuant to Senate Rule 9) |
2016-02-08 | Senate | Second consideration |
2016-01-20 | Senate | First consideration |
2016-01-20 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2015-12-04 | Senate | Referred to TRANSPORTATION |
2015-12-02 | Senate | In the Senate |
2015-12-02 | House | Third consideration and final passage (188-0) |
2015-12-02 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2015-12-01 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2015-12-01 | House | Second consideration |
2015-11-24 | House | Removed from table |
2015-11-23 | House | Laid on the table |
2015-11-23 | House | First consideration |
2015-11-23 | House | Reported as committed |
2015-05-13 | House | Referred to TRANSPORTATION |