PA HB1174 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 22-7)
Status: Engrossed on June 26 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-06-30 - Referred to VETERANS AFFAIRS AND EMERGENCY PREPAREDNESS
Pending: Senate Veterans Affairs & Emergency Preparedness Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 26 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-06-30 - Referred to VETERANS AFFAIRS AND EMERGENCY PREPAREDNESS
Pending: Senate Veterans Affairs & Emergency Preparedness Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An Act amending Title 35 (Health and Safety) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in emergency telephone service, providing for prohibited release of information.
Title
In emergency telephone service, providing for prohibited release of information.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-06-26 - House - HB 1174 PN 1280, FP (Y: 193 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-30 | Senate | Referred to VETERANS AFFAIRS AND EMERGENCY PREPAREDNESS |
2011-06-26 | Senate | In the Senate |
2011-06-26 | House | Third consideration and final passage (193-0) |
2011-06-26 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2011-06-24 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2011-06-24 | House | Second consideration |
2011-06-24 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2011-06-15 | House | Re-committed to RULES |
2011-06-15 | House | First consideration |
2011-06-15 | House | Reported as committed |
2011-04-12 | House | Re-referred to VETERANS AFFAIRS AND EMERGENCY PREPAREDNESS |
2011-04-12 | House | Reported with request to re-refer to VETERANS AFFAIRS AND EMERGENCY PREPAREDNESS |
2011-03-23 | House | Referred to JUDICIARY |