PA HB1172 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-01 - Act No. 41
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending the act of July 2, 1993 (P.L.345, No.48), entitled "An act empowering the General Counsel or his designee to issue subpoenas for certain licensing board activities; providing for hearing examiners in the Bureau of Professional and Occupational Affairs; providing additional powers to the Commissioner of Professional and Occupational Affairs; and further providing for civil penalties and license suspension," providing for licensure by endorsement.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Amending the act of July 2, 1993 (P.L.345, No.48), entitled "An act empowering the General Counsel or his designee to issue subpoenas for certain licensing board activities; providing for hearing examiners in the Bureau of Professional and Occupational Affairs; providing additional powers to the Commissioner of Professional and Occupational Affairs; and further providing for civil penalties and license suspension," providing for licensure by endorsement.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-25 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-25 - House - House Floor: HB 1172 PN 1989, CONCUR (Y: 201 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-06-24 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 1172 PN 1989, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-24 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 1172 PN 1989, A2101, MUTH AMENDMENT NO. A-2101 (Y: 23 N: 26 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-06-12 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-04 - Senate - Senate Consumer Protection And Professional Licensure: Reported as Amended (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-15 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-15 - House - House Floor: HB 1172 PN 1781, FP (Y: 188 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2019-05-08 - House - House Professional Licensure: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-08 - House - House Professional Licensure: Adopt Amendment A00870 (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-01HouseAct No. 41
2019-07-01HouseApproved by the Governor
2019-06-26HousePresented to the Governor
2019-06-26HouseSigned in Senate
2019-06-25HouseSigned in House
2019-06-25HouseHouse concurred in Senate amendments (201-0)
2019-06-25HouseRe-reported as committed
2019-06-25HouseReferred to RULES
2019-06-24HouseIn the House
2019-06-24SenateThird consideration and final passage (49-0)
2019-06-12SenateRe-reported as committed
2019-06-10SenateRe-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
2019-06-10SenateSecond consideration
2019-06-04SenateFirst consideration
2019-06-04SenateReported as amended
2019-05-24SenateReferred to CONSUMER PROTECTION AND PROFESSIONAL LICENSURE
2019-05-15SenateIn the Senate
2019-05-15HouseThird consideration and final passage (188-0)
2019-05-15HouseRe-reported as committed
2019-05-14HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2019-05-14HouseSecond consideration
2019-05-13HouseRemoved from table
2019-05-08HouseLaid on the table
2019-05-08HouseFirst consideration
2019-05-08HouseReported as amended
2019-04-10HouseReferred to PROFESSIONAL LICENSURE

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2019&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=1172
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=1172&pn=1358
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=1172&pn=1781
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=1172&pn=1989
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=34&theDate=05/08/2019&RollCallId=469
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=34&theDate=05/08/2019&RollCallId=470
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=329
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=05/15/2019&RollCallId=573
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=3&theDate=06/12/2019&RollCallId=303
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=7&theDate=06/04/2019&RollCallId=307
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=S&rc_nbr=171
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=S&rc_nbr=172
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=574
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=44&theDate=06/25/2019&RollCallId=924

Bill Comments

feedback