PA HB1172 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 2 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-02 - Act No. 39
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 2 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-02 - Act No. 39
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of December 31, 1965 (P.L.1257, No.511), known as The Local Tax Enabling Act, further providing for limitations on rates of specific taxes.
Title
Further providing for limitations on rates of specific taxes.
Sponsors
Rep. Jim Christiana [R] | Rep. William Kortz [D] | Rep. Mauree Gingrich [R] | Rep. Thomas Caltagirone [D] |
Rep. Robert Matzie [D] | Rep. Gordon Denlinger [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-06-26 - Senate - HB 1172 PN 1606, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-25 - Senate - Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-19 - Senate - Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-13 - House - HB 1172 PN 1606, FP (Y: 197 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-06-25 - Senate - Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-19 - Senate - Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-13 - House - HB 1172 PN 1606, FP (Y: 197 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-02 | Senate | Act No. 39 |
2013-07-02 | Senate | Approved by the Governor |
2013-06-28 | Senate | Presented to the Governor |
2013-06-27 | Senate | Signed in Senate |
2013-06-27 | Senate | Signed in House |
2013-06-26 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (49-0) |
2013-06-25 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2013-06-20 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2013-06-20 | Senate | Second consideration |
2013-06-19 | Senate | First consideration |
2013-06-19 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2013-05-24 | Senate | Referred to FINANCE |
2013-05-13 | Senate | In the Senate |
2013-05-13 | House | Third consideration and final passage (197-0) |
2013-05-13 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2013-05-07 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2013-05-07 | House | Second consideration |
2013-05-06 | House | Removed from table |
2013-04-24 | House | Laid on the table |
2013-04-24 | House | First consideration |
2013-04-24 | House | Reported as amended |
2013-04-17 | House | Referred to APPROPRIATIONS |