PA HB1161 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on June 14 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-20 - Referred to CONSUMER PROTECTION AND PROFESSIONAL LICENSURE
Pending: Senate Consumer Protection & Professional Licensure Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 14 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-20 - Referred to CONSUMER PROTECTION AND PROFESSIONAL LICENSURE
Pending: Senate Consumer Protection & Professional Licensure Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act providing for local solar program, for renewable energy credits and for powers and duties of the Pennsylvania Public Utility Commission.
Title
Providing for local solar program, for renewable energy credits and for powers and duties of the Pennsylvania Public Utility Commission.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-14 - House - House Floor: HB 1161 PN 2730, FP (Y: 167 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt Amendment A03670 (Y: 22 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Amended (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - House - House Floor: HB 1161 PN 1284, 2021 A775, ORTITAY (Y: 155 N: 46 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-19 - House - House Consumer Affairs: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-19 - House - House Consumer Affairs: Adopt Amendment A00721 (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-19 - House - House Consumer Affairs: Adopt Amendment A00720 (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt Amendment A03670 (Y: 22 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Amended (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - House - House Floor: HB 1161 PN 1284, 2021 A775, ORTITAY (Y: 155 N: 46 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-19 - House - House Consumer Affairs: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-19 - House - House Consumer Affairs: Adopt Amendment A00721 (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-19 - House - House Consumer Affairs: Adopt Amendment A00720 (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-20 | Senate | Referred to CONSUMER PROTECTION AND PROFESSIONAL LICENSURE |
2022-06-14 | Senate | In the Senate |
2022-06-14 | House | Third consideration and final passage (167-33) |
2022-06-08 | House | Removed from table |
2022-06-08 | House | Laid on the table |
2022-02-09 | House | Re-reported as amended |
2022-02-09 | House | Amended in House Committee on APPROPRIATIONS |
2021-04-21 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2021-04-21 | House | Second consideration, with amendments |
2021-04-20 | House | Removed from table |
2021-04-19 | House | Laid on the table |
2021-04-19 | House | First consideration |
2021-04-19 | House | Reported as amended |
2021-04-12 | House | Referred to CONSUMER AFFAIRS |