PA HB1121 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 23-8)
Status: Passed on October 25 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-10-25 - Act No. 200
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 23-8)
Status: Passed on October 25 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-10-25 - Act No. 200
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An Act amending Titles 18 (Crimes and Offenses) and 42 (Judiciary and Judicial Procedure) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, providing for the offense of recruiting criminal gang members and for sentencing for offenses committed in association with a criminal gang.
Title
Providing for the offense of recruiting criminal gang members and for sentencing for offenses committed in association with a criminal gang.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-10-16 - House - HB 1121 PN 4147, CONCUR (Y: 195 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2012-10-03 - Senate - HB 1121 PN 4147, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 45 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-10-01 - Senate - Re-Reported as Amended (Y: 25 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-09-25 - Senate - Reported as Amended (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-04 - House - HB 1121 PN 1748, 2011 A1884, REICHLEY (Y: 195 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2011-05-04 - House - HB 1121 PN 1748, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 195 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2011-05-03 - House - HB 1121 PN 1526, 2011 A1678, B. BOYLE (Y: 197 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2011-05-03 - House - HB 1121 PN 1526, 2011 A1711, WILLIAMS (Y: 197 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2011-05-03 - House - HB 1121 PN 1526, 2011 A1679, REICHLEY (Y: 197 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2012-10-03 - Senate - HB 1121 PN 4147, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 45 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-10-01 - Senate - Re-Reported as Amended (Y: 25 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-09-25 - Senate - Reported as Amended (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-04 - House - HB 1121 PN 1748, 2011 A1884, REICHLEY (Y: 195 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2011-05-04 - House - HB 1121 PN 1748, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 195 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2011-05-03 - House - HB 1121 PN 1526, 2011 A1678, B. BOYLE (Y: 197 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2011-05-03 - House - HB 1121 PN 1526, 2011 A1711, WILLIAMS (Y: 197 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2011-05-03 - House - HB 1121 PN 1526, 2011 A1679, REICHLEY (Y: 197 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-10-25 | House | Act No. 200 |
2012-10-25 | House | Approved by the Governor |
2012-10-18 | House | Presented to the Governor |
2012-10-16 | House | Signed in Senate |
2012-10-16 | House | Signed in House |
2012-10-16 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments (195-0) |
2012-10-16 | House | Re-reported on concurrence, as committed |
2012-10-03 | House | Referred to RULES |
2012-10-03 | House | In the House |
2012-10-03 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (45-3) |
2012-10-01 | Senate | Re-reported as amended |
2012-10-01 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2012-10-01 | Senate | Second consideration |
2012-09-25 | Senate | First consideration |
2012-09-25 | Senate | Reported as amended |
2011-05-06 | Senate | Referred to JUDICIARY |
2011-05-04 | Senate | In the Senate |
2011-05-04 | House | Final passage (195-0) |
2011-05-04 | House | Third consideration, with amendments |
2011-05-04 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2011-05-03 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2011-05-03 | House | Second consideration, with amendments |
2011-05-02 | House | Removed from table |
2011-04-12 | House | Laid on the table |
2011-04-12 | House | First consideration |
2011-04-12 | House | Reported as amended |
2011-03-17 | House | Referred to JUDICIARY |