PA HB1100 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 43-0)
Status: Vetoed on March 27 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-27 - Veto No. 2
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending the act of March 4, 1971 (P.L.6, No.2), known as the Tax Reform Code of 1971, providing for energy and fertilizer manufacturing tax credit.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Providing for energy and fertilizer manufacturing tax credit.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-04 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 23 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 1100 PN 3259, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 39 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - House - House Floor: HB 1100 PN 3259, CONCUR (Y: 157 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 13 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-11-19 - Senate - Senate Finance: Reported as Committed (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-19 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 22 N: 13 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-19 - House - House Floor: HB 1100 PN 1593, FP (Y: 139 N: 46 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - House - House Finance: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 14 N: 7 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-27HouseVeto No. 2
2020-03-27HouseVetoed by the Governor
2020-03-18HousePresented to the Governor
2020-03-18HouseSigned in Senate
2020-02-04HouseSigned in House
2020-02-04HouseHouse concurred in Senate amendments (157-35)
2020-02-04HouseRe-reported on concurrence, as committed
2020-02-04HouseReferred to RULES
2020-02-04HouseIn the House
2020-02-04SenateThird consideration and final passage (39-11)
2020-02-03SenateAmended on third consideration
2020-01-28SenateRe-reported as committed
2019-11-21SenateRe-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
2019-11-21SenateSecond consideration
2019-11-19SenateFirst consideration
2019-11-19SenateReported as committed
2019-09-25SenateReferred to FINANCE
2019-09-19SenateIn the Senate
2019-09-19HouseThird consideration and final passage (139-46)
2019-09-19HouseRe-reported as committed
2019-09-17HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2019-09-17HouseSecond consideration
2019-09-17HouseRemoved from table
2019-09-17HouseLaid on the table
2019-09-17HouseRe-reported as committed
2019-06-11HouseRe-committed to RULES
2019-06-11HouseFirst consideration
2019-06-11HouseReported as committed
2019-04-29HouseReferred to FINANCE

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2019&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=1100
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=1100&pn=1593
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=1100&pn=3259
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=16&theDate=06/11/2019&RollCallId=658
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=658
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=09/19/2019&RollCallId=1049
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=25&theDate=11/19/2019&RollCallId=660
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=3&theDate=01/28/2020&RollCallId=725
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=1114
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=S&rc_nbr=403
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=44&theDate=02/04/2020&RollCallId=1729

Bill Comments

feedback