PA HB1041 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 20-1)
Status: Engrossed on November 8 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-11-09 - Referred to EDUCATION
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending the act of March 10, 1949 (P.L.30, No.14), known as the Public School Code of 1949, in pupils and attendance, further providing for home education program.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In pupils and attendance, further providing for home education program.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-11-08 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 22 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-11-08 - House - House Floor: HB 1041 PN 1452, FP (Y: 136 N: 64 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-05 - House - House Floor: HB 1041 PN 1282, 2021 A905, CIRESI (Y: 201 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-05 - House - House Floor: HB 1041 PN 1282, 2021 A891, LONGIETTI (Y: 90 N: 111 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-04-19 - House - House Education: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 15 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-19 - House - House Education: Adopt Amendment A00734 (Y: 16 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-11-09SenateReferred to EDUCATION
2021-11-08SenateIn the Senate
2021-11-08HouseThird consideration and final passage (136-64)
2021-11-08HouseRe-reported as committed
2021-05-05HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2021-05-05HouseSecond consideration, with amendments
2021-05-04HouseRemoved from table
2021-04-19HouseLaid on the table
2021-04-19HouseFirst consideration
2021-04-19HouseReported as amended
2021-03-29HouseReferred to EDUCATION

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2021&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=1041
Texthttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2021&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=1041&pn=1077
Texthttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2021&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=1041&pn=1282
Texthttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2021&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=1041&pn=1452
Supplementhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/WU01/LI/BI/FN/2021/0/HB1041P1452.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2021&sInd=0&cteeCde=12&theDate=04/19/2021&RollCallId=294
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2021&sInd=0&cteeCde=12&theDate=04/19/2021&RollCallId=295
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2021&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=189
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2021&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=190
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2021&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=566
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2021&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=11/08/2021&RollCallId=1023

Bill Comments

feedback